Gomez v. Curry et al
Petitioner: Elkin Gomez
Respondent: B. Curry and Board of Prison Terms
Case Number: 3:2007cv04833
Filed: September 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Board of Prison Terms, B. Curry against Elkin Gomez, the instant petition is hereby DISMISSED, both as moot and by reason of petitioners failure to comply with the Courts order to notify the Court of a change of address so as to avoid dismissal of the petition for failure to prosecute. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PETITION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 5, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 20, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 12 REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 9, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Curry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elkin Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Board of Prison Terms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?