Grizzle v. Horel
Petitioner: Eliot Scott Grizzle
Respondent: Robert Horel
Case Number: 3:2007cv04845
Filed: September 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY re 39 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE: BRIEFING ON PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY [DOCKET NO. 39] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 31 Ex Parte Application (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER of appointment of and authorities to pay court appointed counsel, Benjamin L. Coleman, Esq.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/28/08. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grizzle v. Horel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eliot Scott Grizzle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Horel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?