Horvath v. Winter
Plaintiff: Pauline Horvath
Defendant: Donald C. Winter
Case Number: 3:2007cv04952
Filed: September 25, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER RE MOTION FOR PARTIAL RELIEF AND CLARIFYING COURTS ORDER THAT THE COURT SHALL NOT ACCEPT ANY NEW FILINGS IN THIS CLOSED CASE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/8/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RE-OPEN CASE: Responses due by 7/27/2012. Replies due by 8/10/2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/20/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER RE: CORRESPONDENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/30/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY LETTER DATED OCTOBER 22, 2009. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/23/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING 78 Stipulation Regarding Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Defendant is order to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER RESOLVING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/10/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/2/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING 49 Stipulation TO CONTINUE CERTAIN PRE-TRIAL DATES. The Defendant is ordered to serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiff forthwith.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/19/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 42 Plaintiff's Request to Change Time of May 4, 2009 Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 5/4/2009 10:00 AM has been changed to 5/4/2009 01:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/19/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order. Settlement Conference set for 5/4/2009 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/22/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/20/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horvath v. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Horvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald C. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?