California State Foster Parent Association et al v. Wagner et al
Plaintiff: California State Foster Parent Association, California State Care Providers Association and Legal Advocates for Permanent Parenting
Defendant: John A. Wagner and Mary Ault
Special_master: Marc N. Bernstein
Case Number: 3:2007cv05086
Filed: October 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER VACATING SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 22, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF AND CLARIFICATION OF THE ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' SECOND MOTION FOR FURTHER RELIEF by Hon. William Alsup denying 184 Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; denying 184 Motion.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' SECOND MOTION FOR FURTHER RELIEF by Hon. William Alsup granting 170 Motion.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Judge Alsup denying 171 Motion to Shorten Time (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER REGARDING LETTER. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 13, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FURTHER RELIEF by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 154 Motion for Permanent Injunction (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER REQUESTING JOINT PROPOSED AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 13, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' RENEWED REQUEST TO FILE LATE OBJECTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 28, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER ADOPTING SPECIAL MASTER'S DECISION AND ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 10, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING MATTER TO SPECIAL MASTER MARC BERNSTEIN PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 53 (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/14/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER RE MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AND VACATING HEARING [re 111 Renotice motion hearing, filed by Legal Advocates for Permanent Parenting, California State Foster Parent Association, California State Care Providers Association]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/6/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATOIN OF ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER RE CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ORDER VACATING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE by Judge Alsup denying 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion for Summary Judgment (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DATE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California State Foster Parent Association et al v. Wagner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California State Foster Parent Association
Represented By: Richard Steven Ballinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California State Care Providers Association
Represented By: Richard Steven Ballinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legal Advocates for Permanent Parenting
Represented By: Richard Steven Ballinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Wagner
Represented By: Susan M. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ault
Represented By: George Dey Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Marc N. Bernstein
Represented By: Marc N. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?