Friend et al v. The Hertz Corporation
Plaintiff: Melinda Friend, John Nhieu, Robert Higareda and Billy Hart
Defendant: Hertz Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv05222
Filed: October 11, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 24, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER RE: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties are directed to submit, no later than February 27, 2015, a copy of the settlement agreement, or, in the alternative, to file a revised stipulation of dismissal without a request for the retention of jurisdiction. The Case Management Conference, scheduled for February 20, 2015, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 17, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/20/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for September 19, 2014 is continued to October 17, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 12, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR ISSUE CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 8, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 28, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from December 13, 2013 to April 25, 2014. An updated Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than April 18, 2014.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 9, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case management conference is continued from July 19, 2013 to December 13, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 12, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled November 16, 2012 is continued to March 8, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 9, 2012. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from March 30, 2012 to November 16, 2012. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than November 9, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from October 28, 2011 to March 30, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed no later than March 23, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 24, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for June 3, 2011 is continued to October 28, 2011. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than October 21, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 1, 2011.(mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to June 3, 2011. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than May 27, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 21, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 24, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from February 25, 2011 to March 25, 2011, at 10:30 a.m. An updated Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than March 18, 2011.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 22, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 4, 2011 HEARING. The Court deems the motion for class certification and the motion to strike appropriate for decision on the parties' respective written submissions, and vacates the hearing scheduled for February 4, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 1, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY FRANK B. SHUSTER PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 27, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION FOR ONE WEEK. The hearing scheduled for January 28, 2011 is continued to February 4, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 21, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE RESPONSE TO CASE CITED IN SUR-REPLY. Plaintiffs are directed to file the document attached as Exhibit A to the administrative motion, no later than December 23, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 15, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDA; CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE. The parties shall file their respective supplemental memorandum, not to exceed ten pa ges in length, no later than January 7, 2011. The hearings on plaintiffs' motion for class certification and defendant's motion to strike are continued from December 17, 2010 to January 28, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 14, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 3, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY GRACE E. PARASMO PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 27, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' JOINT REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 21, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY STEPHEN T. RODD PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 4, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY STEPHANIE AMIN-GIWNER PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 21, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 USCA ORDER: The motion for reconsideration en banc is denied as moot. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friend et al v. The Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Friend
Represented By: Stephanie Dawn Amin-Giwner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nhieu
Represented By: Stephanie Dawn Amin-Giwner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Higareda
Represented By: Lisa Mireille Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Hart
Represented By: Lisa Mireille Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Corporation
Represented By: Christopher David Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?