Broyles v. A.U.L. Corporation Long-Term Disability Insurance Plan
Plaintiff: Patricia Broyles
Defendant: A.U.L. Corporation Long-Term Disability Insurance Plan
Mediator: Julian M. Baum
Case Number: 3:2007cv05305
Filed: November 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of A.U.L. Corporation Long-Term Disability Insurance Plan, Standard Insurance Company against Patricia Broyles. 1. Plaintiffs motion for judgment on her claim for benefits is hereby DENIED.2. Defendant and real party in interests cross-motion for judgment on plaintiffs claim for benefits is hereby GRANTED. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING 46 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT UNDER RULE 52; GRANTING 52 DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR JUDGMENT UNDER RULE 52; GRANTING 51 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE; FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 12, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 5, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND BRIEFING. Plaintiff shall file her motion on the merits no later than October 10, 2008. The hearing on the motion is continued to November 14, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broyles v. A.U.L. Corporation Long-Term Disability Insurance Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Broyles
Represented By: David Joseph Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.U.L. Corporation Long-Term Disability Insurance Plan
Represented By: Shawn Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Julian M. Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?