United States of America v. Approximately $61,505 In United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $61,505 In United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2007cv05413
Filed: October 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/25/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SETTLEMENT STIPULATION AND FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 16, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER VACATING MARCH 6, 2009 HEARING. The motion to suppress is deemed withdrawn without prejudice, and the hearing scheduled for March 6, 2009 at 2:00 p.m. is vacated. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to April 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 5, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR SUPPRESSION HEARING AND ORDER. The United States shall file any additional declarations and briefs by January 16, 2009. The claimant shall file any declarations and additional briefs by February 6, 2009. The parties shall file a stipulated statement of facts by February 13, 2009. The hearing on the motion to suppress is set for March 6, 2009, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 23, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE SUPPRESSION HEARING AND ORDER. Counsel shall submit, no later than Thursday, December 18, 2008 at 5:00 p.m., a jointly-proposed supplemental briefing schedule and hearing date. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 11, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTION TO SUPPRESS. The parties shall appear on December 12, 2008 at 2:00 p.m., at which time the Court will conduct a hearing on claimant's motion to suppress. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING CLAIMANT TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 1, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $61,505 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Susan B. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $61,505 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?