Sierra Club et al v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Sierra Club, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Physicians for Social Responsibility and UNITE HERE
Defendant: Stephen L. Johnson
Case Number: 3:2007cv05435
Filed: October 24, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to July 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 12, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to May 15, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. via teleconference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 2, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. The Case Management Conference is reset to March 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 15, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to December 19, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 3, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from October 3, 2008 to November 7, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 30, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Intervene; vacating hearing. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Club et al v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: James Russell Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Law and Policy Center
Represented By: James Russell Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations
Represented By: James Russell Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Physicians for Social Responsibility
Represented By: James Russell Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITE HERE
Represented By: James Russell Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?