Goldsby v. Adecco, Inc
Plaintiff: Shavotnae Goldsby
Defendant: Adecco, Inc
Case Number: 3:2007cv05604
Filed: November 5, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 13, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from February 20, 2009 to March 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 13, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MODIFY PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. In light of the pendency of plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Motion to Modify Pretrial Preparation Order, the Status Conference is continued from February 6, 2009 to February 20, 2009. A Joint Status Conference Statement shall be filed no later than February 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 30, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER VACATING JANUARY 23, 2009 HEARING. Having read and considered the parties' respective submissions, the Court finds plaintiffs' motion for class certification and motion to modify suitable for decision on the papers submitted, and vacates the hearing scheduled for January 23, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 21, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER AFFORDING PARTIES OPPORTUNITY TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND MOTION TO MODIFY PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. No later than December 22, 2008, defendant shall file any supplemental opposition. No later than December 22, 2008, plaintiff shall file any response to defendant's objection to plaintiff's evidence. No later than December 22, 2008, plaintiff shall file any supplemental brief to address the issue of numerousity; no later than January 2, 2009, defendant shall file any response thereto. The hearing on plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Motion to Modify is continued from December 19, 2008 to January 23, 2009, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 12, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MODIFY PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. The hearing on plaintiff's Motion to Modify is continued from December 5, 2008 to December 19, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 3, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER MODIFYING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF'S CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION AND CONTINUING HEARING. Defendant shall file opposition papers by November 13, 2008. Plaintiff shall file reply papers, if any, by November 24, 2008. The hearing on plaintiff's motion for class certification is continued from December 5, 2008 to December 19, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 3, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY MEENOO CHAHBAZI AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Re: Communications With Putative Class Members. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/18/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FURTHER MODIFY PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER; VACATING HEARING. The deadline to file a motion for class certification is extended to September 30, 2008. Any hearing on such motion shall be conducted on December 5, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2008.(mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re 34 August 29, 2008 Order Referring In Part and Denying In Part Plaintiff's Objections. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/2/2008. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldsby v. Adecco, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shavotnae Goldsby
Represented By: Robin Gibson Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adecco, Inc
Represented By: Ross Allen Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?