Worthy v. Library of Congress Copyright Office Featured Case
Plaintiff: Lonnell B. Worthy
Defendant: Library of Congress Copyright Office
Case Number: 3:2007cv05736
Filed: November 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2008 Filing 15 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Breyer on 02/22/2008. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2008: # 1 Certificate of Service) (be, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Breyer on 02/22/2008. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2008: # 1 Certificate of Service) (be, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Breyer granting 10 Motion to Dismiss (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
December 21, 2007 Filing 12 Reply Memorandum re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Federal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Federal Defendant's Reply to Motion to Dismiss filed byLibrary of Congress Copyright Office. (Swanson, Joann) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
November 26, 2007 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2008 08:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007)
November 19, 2007 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Federal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Library of Congress Copyright Office. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Swanson, Joann) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
November 16, 2007 Filing 9 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 10 . *** ERRATA re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Federal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Library of Congress Copyright Office. (Swanson, Joann) (Filed on 11/16/2007) Modified on 11/19/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2007 Filing 8 Proposed Order re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Federal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Proposed Dismissal Order by Library of Congress Copyright Office. (Swanson, Joann) (Filed on 11/16/2007) Modified on 11/19/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2007 Filing 7 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 10 . *** MOTION to Dismiss Federal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Library of Congress Copyright Office. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Swanson, Joann) (Filed on 11/16/2007) Modified on 11/19/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/16/07. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2007)
November 15, 2007 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 14, 2007 Filing 4 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Library of Congress Copyright Office and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Swanson, Joann) (Filed on 11/14/2007)
November 13, 2007 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007)
November 13, 2007 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Library of Congress Copyright Office re 1 Notice of Removal (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2007 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/15/2008. Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2008 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 CMC Standing Order# 2 JCS Standing Order# 3 New Standing Order)(gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007)
November 13, 2007 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL; No Process from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-07-461259. (Filing fee Waived). Filed by Library of Congress Copyright Office. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worthy v. Library of Congress Copyright Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnell B. Worthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Library of Congress Copyright Office
Represented By: Joann M. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?