Markel American Insurance Company v. Pacific Asian Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Markel American Insurance Company
Defendant: Pacific Asian Enterprises, Inc., Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc. and Hubbell Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2007cv05749
Filed: November 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/1/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 43 Motion to Dismiss (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Pacific Asian Enterprises to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/1/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Hubbell Incoporated to file its responsive pleading (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markel American Insurance Company v. Pacific Asian Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markel American Insurance Company
Represented By: Norman L. Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Asian Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubbell Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?