Chairez v. Adams
Petitioner: Arturo Chairez
Respondent: M. Adams
Case Number: 3:2007cv05767
Filed: November 14, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING 26 PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 2, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 24 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 13, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of M. Adams against Arturo Chairez. The Court finds the instant petition for a writ of habeas corpus is untimely under 28 U.S.C. § 2244(d)(1), and hereby GRANTS respondents motion to dismiss. Accordingly, the petition is hereby DISMISSED. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO SERVE RESPONDENT WITH PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS (DOCKET NO. 13); SCHEDULING REPLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 16, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING 11 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AS PREMATURE; SETTING NEW BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING 7 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 29, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chairez v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arturo Chairez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?