Wiliams v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert Michael Wiliams
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, American Express Travel Related Services, Inc., Discover Financial Services, Pinnacle Credit Services, Inc., Asset Acceptance, LLC and National Credit Adjusters, LLC
Case Number: 3:2007cv05956
Filed: November 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER For Removal And Seal of Documents 96 and 99 re 111 Proposed Order filed by Robert Michael Wiliams. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/25/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 09/21/2009. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (30 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/16/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER re 105 Case Management Conference - Further, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference, Case Reopened, Set Hearings. Settlement Conference set for 9/16/2009 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 6/12/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER for DISMISSAL re 100 Stipulation filed by Robert Michael Wiliams, Equifax Information Services, LLC terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/4/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (30 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/6/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiliams v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Michael Wiliams
Represented By: Mark F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Travel Related Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Credit Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Acceptance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?