Millard v. Laura-Lou, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Andi Millard
Defendant: Laura-Lou, Inc. and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2007cv06014
Filed: November 28, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's request that Theodore E. Bacon be its attorney of record in place and stead of Brian O'Grady is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 18, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on May 29, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/24/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte is continued to April 2009, her calendar permitting. The Status Conference is continued from April 18, 2009 to May 29, 2009; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than May 22, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 16, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 3/18/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/2/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. A Case Management Conference is set for January 23, 2009. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than January 16, 2009. The October 21, 2008 order to show cause is discharged. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 12, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than November 4, 2008, why the action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. In the event plaintiff files a Motion for Administrative Relief Requesting Case Management Conference on or before November 4, 2008, this Order to Show Cause will stand discharged without further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 21, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millard v. Laura-Lou, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andi Millard
Represented By: Paul Leslie Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura-Lou, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?