Children's Hospital and Research Center at Oakland v. Health Plan of Nevada, Inc.,
Plaintiff: Children's Hospital and Research Center at Oakland
Defendant: Health Plan of Nevada, Inc.,
Case Number: 3:2007cv06069
Filed: November 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor Children's Hospital and Research Center at Oakland in the amount of $117,322.66. Re 113 Affidavit (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/30/2009. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER allowing equipment for use in trial (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting re 74 Stipulated Protective Order filed by Health Plan of Nevada, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/25/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 44 Defendant's Motion to Compel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 COURT TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/12/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/11/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER Discovery due by 2/6/2009. Bench Trial set for 4/6/2009 09:30 AM. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/8/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Children's Hospital and Research Center at Oakland v. Health Plan of Nevada, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Children's Hospital and Research Center at Oakland
Represented By: Barry Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Plan of Nevada, Inc.,
Represented By: Andrew Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?