Campbell v. Yeo et al
Plaintiff: David Campbell
Defendant: Timothy Yeo and TAF Group Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2007cv06229
Filed: December 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANTS' ANSWERS & ENTERING DEFAULT Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/14/2009: Defendants' Answers are Stricken & their Default is Entered & that a Hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment is Scheduled for 5/21/2009 at 9:00 a.m.. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/13/2009 04:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 4/1/2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/19/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 3/16/2009 at 09:30 AM, Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco, CA. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/05/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 55 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear White O'Connor Fink & Brenner LLP's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record filed by TAF Group Ltd., Timothy Yeo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/19/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 46 Motion (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND ENE COMPLETION DEADLINE AND TO CONTINUE SCHEDULED ENE SESSION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/23/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER EXTENDING ENE COMPLETION DATE AND SCHEDULING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/12/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 10/27/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/22/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Scheduling Status Conference and Extending ADR Completion Deadline.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/1/08. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 31 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Yeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Campbell
Represented By: M. Armon Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Yeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAF Group Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?