Vega et al v. Downey Savings & Loan et al
Plaintiff: Rafael Cacho Vega and Miguel Cacho Vega
Defendant: Downey Savings & Loan, Absolute Investment Group, Inc., Linda Tran, Pablo Curiel and Foreclosure Consultants, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv06304
Filed: December 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1601 Truth in Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 2/9/2010 Granting re 59 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Absolute Investment Group. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (tn, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER extending time to respond to the Court and continuing the Motion Hearing to 2/1/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/05/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re: hearing on 59 Motion for default judgment. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/23/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 53 Plaintiffs' request to strike 14 Answer to Complaint by Defendant Absolute Investment Group. Default is entered against Absolute Investment Group. Plaintiffs to file motion for default judgment on or before 12/07/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 46 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Shawn Robert Parr terminated as counsel for Absolute Investment Group, which shall have until 10/30/09 to find new counsel. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson re: 46 Motion to withdraw by counsel for Defendant Absolute Investment Group. Reply, if any, due by 08/24/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER continuing motion hearing and case management conference to 07/06/09 at 10:00 AM. Joint case management conference statement due by 06/30/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/29/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Continuing hearing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on May 1, 2009. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference. Further Settlement Conference, to be held telephonically, set for 3/3/2009 03:00 PM. The Court will initiate the individual conference calls with each party. Signed Magistrate by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/12/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order. Settlement Conference set for 2/10/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/9/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER allowing defense counsel to appear by telephone at the CMC on 12/01/08. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/25/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vega et al v. Downey Savings & Loan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Cacho Vega
Represented By: Robert F. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Cacho Vega
Represented By: Robert F. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downey Savings & Loan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Investment Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo Curiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foreclosure Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?