Romero v. Ayers
Case Number: 3:2007cv06382
Filed: December 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1651 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2010 Filing 14 United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit CASE NUMBER 10-15993 for re 12 Notice of Appeal filed by Isidro Romero. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 6, 2010 Filing 13 Certified & Transmitted Record on Appeal to United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit re 12 & re 10 Notice of Appeal/Request for Certificate of Appealability. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Denying re 10 Request for Certificate of Appealability. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Service) (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL/REQUEST for Certificate of Appealability re 10 as to the Court's re 8 Order & re 9 Judgment Filed by Isidro Romero.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 10 REQUEST for Certificate of Appealability Filed by Isidro Romero. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
March 29, 2010 Filing 9 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/26/10. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/26/10. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
October 1, 2008 Filing 7 TRAVERSE & Memorandum of Points & Authorities to the re 6 Answer/Response to Habeas Corpus Petition Filed by Petitioner Isidro Romero. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 2, 2008 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Memorandum of Points and Authorities byRobert L. Ayers, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 Part 1 of 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 Part 2 of 2, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6)(Schesser, Stacey) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/01/08. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2008)
May 29, 2008 FILING FEE RECEIVED re: 1 : $5.00, Receipt Number 34611019656. (tn, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Extension of Time to file In Forma Pauperis Application by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Re 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Completed application due within 30 days from the date this order is filed). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
January 24, 2008 Filing 3 PRISONER'S APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filed by Petitioner Isidro Romero. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2008)
December 17, 2007 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 30 days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2007)
December 17, 2007 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5; ifpp). Filed by Isidro Romero. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2007)
December 17, 2007 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?