Jackson v. Yang Ming America Corporation
Plaintiff: Darryl Jackson
Defendant: Yang Ming America Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv06412
Filed: December 19, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The parties having advised the Court that they have agreed to a settlement of this cause, it is ordered that plaintiff's claims alleged against defendant be dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party he reto shall certify to this Court, within ninety (90) days, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 1, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE APRIL 13, 2010 TRIAL DATE AND SETTING MAY 21, 2010 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The April 13, 2010 trial date is vacated. A scheduling conference is set for May 21, 2010, at 10:30 a.m. No later than May 14, 2010, the parties shall file a Joint Status Statement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 7, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE APRIL 5, 2010 TRIAL DATE. The April 5, 2010 trial date is vacated, and a new trial date is scheduled for April 12, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 1, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 30, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER FOR DEFENDANT YANG MING (AMERICA) CORPORATION'S COUNSEL, RICHARD C. WOOTTON, TO APPEAR AT TRIAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 24, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/15/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 17, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES. The non-expert discovery cut-off, currently set as October 31, 2008, is reset to December 5, 2008. The deadline for designation of experts, currently set as November 21, 2008 and December 5, 2008 (designation and rebuttal designation), is reset to December 29, 2008 and January 5, 2009, respectively. The expert discovery cut-off, currently set for December 26, 2008, is reset to January 26, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 27, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REFERRING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LARSON. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 7, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 26, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Yang Ming America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Jackson
Represented By: Gary B. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yang Ming America Corporation
Represented By: Mitchell S. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?