Rodriguez et al v. Mt. Zion Enterprises Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Monica Rodriguez, Maria De Jesus R.R. and Maria Aracely Lopes
Defendant: Mt. Zion Enterprises Inc. and Gondosinaryo Listyo
Case Number: 3:2007cv06439
Filed: December 21, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/9/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 37 Notice (Other) filed by Mt. Zion Enterprises Inc., Gondosinaryo Listyo. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 02/24/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 2/26/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/30/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re 31 Notice (Other) filed by Mt. Zion Enterprises Inc., Gondosinaryo Listyo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 22, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING FURTHER STATUS REPORT DATE. Parties shall file joint status report no later than 1/8/2009. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/18/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER VACATING Further Case Management Conference. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than 12/17/08. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/3/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 Stipulation filed by Maria De Jesus R.R.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on November 17, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez et al v. Mt. Zion Enterprises Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Rodriguez
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria De Jesus R.R.
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Aracely Lopes
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Zion Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gondosinaryo Listyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?