Padilla et al v. Yoo Featured Case
Plaintiff: Jose Padilla and Estela Lebron
Defendant: John Yoo
Case Number: 3:2008cv00035
Filed: January 4, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 AMENDED ORDER 68 Order on Motion to Dismiss WITH TYPOGRAPHICAL CORRECTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 18, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 24 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 60 Motion to File Supplemental Material. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF QUESTIONS re Hearing on 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Yoo. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 5, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RE DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/3/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING 51 Stipulation re Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claim for Declaratory Relief. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/2/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re 46 MOTION to Continue and 33 MOTION for Protective Order REQUIRING Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 26, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING AS MODIFIED 46 Motion to Continue Hearing. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING 37 Stipulation CONSOLIDATING HEARING DATES FOR MOTIONS AND FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/13/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 30 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule and to Enlarge Page Limits on Reply. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 14, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING 28 Stipulation Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 13, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule and RESETTING Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 24, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla et al v. Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Padilla
Represented By: Hope R Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estela Lebron
Represented By: Hope R Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?