Marcelos v. Dominguez et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Marcelos
Defendant: Edwin Mauricio Parada Dominguez, Glenda Parada, Lorenzo Parada, Viki Raab, Countrywide Home Loans, Argent Mortgage Company, LLC, Primestar Financial Services, Shoaib Mahmud, Financial Title Company, New Century Title Company and Recontrust Company, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00056
Filed: January 4, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1640 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 194 WRIT of Execution issued (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 191 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup granting 179 Motion for Default Judgment (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF SHOIAB MAHMUD AND ND FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., D/B/A/ PRIMESTAR FINANCIAL SERVICES (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE RE JANUARY 8, 2009, CALENDAR. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/17/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER DISMISSING ARGENT MORTGAGE COMPANY'S COUNTERCLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER DEEMING MOTION WITHDRAWN. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the MDL Panel on 10/10/08. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER RE STIPULATION VACATING TRIAL DATE [re 164 Stipulation filed by Countrywide Home Loans, Recontrust Company, N.A., Argent Mortgage Company, LLC]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/7/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ARGENT MORTGAGE COMPANY, LLC (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE RESPONSIVE PLEADING BY COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC. AND RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 6, 2008. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME IN WHICH NEW CENTURY TITLE COMPANY AND VIKI RAAB MAY RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 4, 2008. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcelos v. Dominguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Marcelos
Represented By: Martin Dante Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Mauricio Parada Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Parada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorenzo Parada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viki Raab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argent Mortgage Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primestar Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoaib Mahmud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Century Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?