Estate of Jeremiah Chass et al v. County of Sonoma et al
Plaintiff: Mark Chass, Yvette Chass, I.C. and Estate of Jeremiah Chass
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Sheriff Bill Cogbill, County of Sonoma, Deputy Sheriff Jim Ryan and Deputy Sheriff John Misita
3Rd Party Defendant: Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 3:2008cv00111
Filed: January 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2009 Filing 51 CLERKS NOTICE: Sent by U.S. MAIL a certified copy of #50 Order to remand a certified copy of the civil docket to the Superior Court of California for the County of Sonoma. Re #50 Order (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO REMAND TO SONOMA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 10, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 49 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re: Remand to Sonoma County Superior Court by County of Sonoma. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 4/10/2009) Modified on 4/13/2009 (aaa, Court Staff).
April 2, 2009 Filing 48 MOTION to Remand filed by Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tate, Lauren) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
March 27, 2009 Filing 47 Minute Entry: Further Status Conference (Date Filed: 3/27/2009). (Not Reported.) (tl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/27/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFFS AS TO COMPLAINT ONLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 20, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 45 First MOTION for Summary Judgment with Memo of Points and Authorities filed by Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of Lauren E. Tate and Exhibits A through D, #2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of LET, Exhibit E, #3 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of LET - Exhibit F, #4 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Tate, Lauren) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 44 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFFS AS TO COMPLAINT ONLY by County of Sonoma. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2009) Modified on 3/20/2009 (aaa, Court Staff).
March 18, 2009 Filing 43 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT UPDATED filed by County of Sonoma. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER APPROVING PETITION FOR MINOR'S COMPROMISE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 12, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 12, 2009 Filing 41 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/9/2009 before Maxine M. Chesney re #38 First MOTION for Settlement Petition for Minor's Compromise filed by I.C., Yvette Chass, Estate of Jeremiah Chass, Mark Chass. Settlement is approved as modified. Proposed order to be modified to reflect changes made on the record. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (fj, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2009)
January 9, 2009 Filing 40 Proposed Order AMENDED Approving Petition for Minor's Compromise by Mark Chass, Yvette Chass. (Schwartz, Andrew) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
December 12, 2008 Filing 39 Proposed Order re #38 First MOTION for Settlement Petition for Minor's Compromise by Yvette Chass. (Schwartz, Andrew) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 11, 2008 Filing 38 First MOTION for Settlement Petition for Minor's Compromise filed by Estate of Jeremiah Chass, Mark Chass, Yvette Chass, I.C.. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Schwartz, Andrew) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
November 3, 2008 Filing 37 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/10/08, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Christine Triska, Telephone number (650) 743-8425. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2009. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 36 RESPONSE to re #35 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,, Supplemental Brief in Supporto f Third Party Defendant Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss; Declaration of Lauren E. Tate by Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital. (Tate, Lauren) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT SANTA ROSA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL'S AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT. To the extent the County seeks indemnity for any damages for which the County may be held liable on (a) plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action (Negligent Infliction of Emotional Distress); (b) plaintiff's prayer for punitive damages; and/or (c) plaintiff's prayer for damages to which plaintiff is entitled solely by reason of a finding of liability under 42 U.S.C. 1983, the motion is granted and, to such extent, the Third Party Complaint is dismissed. In all other respects the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 10, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 34 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2008 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 10/10/2008) re #28 Amended MOTION to Dismiss [No. 27] Motion to Dismiss filed by Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital. (Court Reporter Christine Triska.) (tl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/10/2008)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER VACATING OCTOBER 10, 2008 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 8, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
September 26, 2008 Filing 32 RESPONSE to re #31 Response ( Non Motion ) Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss by Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital. (Tate, Lauren) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 26, 2008 Filing 31 RESPONSE to re #29 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital. (Tate, Lauren) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 16, 2008 Filing 30 Proposed Order re #29 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint by County of Sonoma. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
September 16, 2008 Filing 29 Memorandum in Opposition re #28 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Re: [No. 27] Motion to Dismiss filed byCounty of Sonoma. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
September 3, 2008 Filing 28 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Re: [No. 27] Motion to Dismiss filed by Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Tate, Lauren) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
August 28, 2008 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Tate, Lauren) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 25, 2008 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by County of Sonoma Proof of Service of Third Party Summons and Complaint and Related Documents (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 5, 2008 Filing 25 Third Party Summons Issued as to Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 8/5/2008)
August 4, 2008 Filing 24 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital. Filed byCounty of Sonoma, Bill Cogbill, John Misita, Jim Ryan. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
August 4, 2008 Filing 23 NOTICE by County of Sonoma, Bill Cogbill, John Misita, Jim Ryan re #22 Third Party Complaint Summons on Third Party Complaint (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
August 4, 2008 Filing 22 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #24 . *** THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Estate of Jeremiah Chass. Filed byCounty of Sonoma. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 8/4/2008) Modified on 8/5/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File a Third Party Complaint; Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 1, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 20 Letter Brief to Honorable Maxine M. Chesney filed byCounty of Sonoma. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 19 Declaration of Steven C. Mitchell Re: #18 Motion for Leave to File A Third Party Complaint filed byCounty of Sonoma. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 8/1/2008) Modified on 8/4/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
August 1, 2008 Filing 18 Brief Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' and Third Party Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File filed byCounty of Sonoma. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 30, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
April 29, 2008 Filing 16 STIPULATION /Stipulated [Proposed] Protective Order by County of Sonoma. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 4/29/2008) Modified on 4/30/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/22/2008. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 18, 2008 Filing 14 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/18/2008 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 4/18/2008), Case referred to Private ADR. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2009 10:30 AM. Jury Trial set for 6/29/2009 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2009 03:00 PM. Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2009. Per agreement both sides are limited to 6 depositions to take place prior to mediation.(Court Reporter n/a.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2008)
April 8, 2008 Filing 13 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mark Chass, Yvette Chass. (Schwartz, Andrew) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 4, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 3, 2008 Filing 11 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by County of Sonoma (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 4/3/2008)
April 3, 2008 Filing 10 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2008)
March 19, 2008 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCounty of Sonoma. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2008 10:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2008.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/27/2007. (Attachments: #1 Judge Chesney's Standing Orders)(tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge James Larson no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/17/08. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 17, 2008 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by County of Sonoma. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
February 4, 2008 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Steve Mitchell on behalf of all Defendants on 1/08/2008 by Mark Chass, Yvette Chass. Answer / responsive pleading due 3/08/2008. Waiver of Service due by 3/8/2008. (Schwartz, Andrew) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Proposed Order filed by I.C., Yvette Chass, Estate of Jeremiah Chass, Mark Chass. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/10/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2008)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2008. Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2008 10:30 AM.. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/7/08. (Attachments: #1 Judge Standing Order, #2 Court Standing Order, #3 Consent/Decline Form)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2008: #4 Magistrate Assignment) (ga, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /issued summons against County of Sonoma, Bill Cogbill, John Misita, Jim Ryan ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611014232.). Filed byEstate of Jeremiah Chass, Mark Chass, Yvette Chass, I.C.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2008) (ga, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 Proposed Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem by Estate of Jeremiah Chass, Mark Chass, Yvette Chass, I.C.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2008)
January 7, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Jeremiah Chass et al v. County of Sonoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Sheriff Bill Cogbill
Represented By: Leo R. Bartolotta
Represented By: Matthew Kevin Good
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: County of Sonoma
Represented By: Leo R. Bartolotta
Represented By: Matthew Kevin Good
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Deputy Sheriff Jim Ryan
Represented By: Leo R. Bartolotta
Represented By: Matthew Kevin Good
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Deputy Sheriff John Misita
Represented By: Leo R. Bartolotta
Represented By: Matthew Kevin Good
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Chass
Represented By: Andrew Charles Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick W. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Chass
Represented By: Andrew Charles Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick W. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.C.
Represented By: Andrew Charles Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick W. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Jeremiah Chass
Represented By: Andrew Charles Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick W. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?