Hall v. Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Margaret Hall
Defendant: Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv00114
Filed: January 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (30 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/26/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re 80 Stipulation filed by Margaret Hall. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/8/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER for exchange of expert reports re 76 Stipulation filed by Margaret Hall. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/16/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER to Take Deposition Beyond the Discovery Cut-Off re 65 Stipulation filed by Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/5/ 2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER to CONTINUE TRIAL re 59 Stipulation filed by Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company Jury Trial set for 4/26/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/14/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER continuing dispositive motion hearing date re 24 Stipulation filed by Margaret Hall, Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 24 Stipulation. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/23/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER for filing First Amended Complaint re 18 Stipulation filed by Margaret Hall. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/06/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Hall
Represented By: Glenn R Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?