Trans-Pacific Aviation Services, Inc. v. Primaris Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trans-Pacific Aviation Services, Inc.
Defendant: Primaris Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00139
Filed: January 9, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 WRIT of Execution issued against defendant Primaris Airlines, Inc. in the amount of $275,000.00 (mcl, COURT STAFF)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re 41 Stipulation for entry of judgment filed by Trans-Pacific Aviation Services, Inc. JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiff and against defendant in the amount of $275,000.00 Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/17/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008) Modified on 9/30/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Pla shall have until 3/4/8 to respond to Dfts' counterclaim. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 02/04/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2008)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING re 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Primaris Airlines, Inc. for Dustin A. Johnson. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 02/01/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2008: # 1 Cert Serve) (klh, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trans-Pacific Aviation Services, Inc. v. Primaris Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trans-Pacific Aviation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew John Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primaris Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: William Lowrance Darby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?