Miller et al v. Operadora De Hoteles Villa Mexicana, S.A.
Plaintiff: Jerri Miller and Eric Miller
Defendant: Operadora De Hoteles Villa Mexicana, S.A.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00176
Filed: January 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 02/15/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause and Setting Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 23, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/4/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING re 24 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Money Damages against Def. OPERADORA DE HOTELES VILLA MEXICANA, S.A. filed by Jerri Miller. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/27/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR CLERK OF COURT TO REASSIGN CASE; REPORT & RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/2/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/2/2009 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/26/2009.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/19/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REQUESTING STATUS REPORT re 17 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/27/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER VACATING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/16/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING OSC AND SCHEDULING CMC re 10 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/27/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER VACATING CMC; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/30/2008 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 10/23/2008.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/10/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Operadora De Hoteles Villa Mexicana, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerri Miller
Represented By: Matthew Charles Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Miller
Represented By: Matthew Charles Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Operadora De Hoteles Villa Mexicana, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?