Brady et al v. Deloitte & Touche LLP et al
Plaintiff: James Brady, Travis Call and Sarah Cavanagh
Defendant: Deloitte & Touche LLP and Deloitte Tax LLP
Case Number: 3:2008cv00177
Filed: January 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/15/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER, Motions terminated: 327 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference due to Settlement filed by Sarah Cavanagh, James Brady. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/1/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER, Motions terminated: 323 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Re-Set Case Management Conference and [Proposed] Order filed by Sarah Cavanagh, James Brady. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2016 10:45 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/8/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL 316 317 .(Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER, Motions terminated: 318 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Re-set Case Management Conference; Proposed Order filed by Sarah Cavanagh, James Brady. Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/23/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER, Motions terminated: 314 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Re-Set Case Management Conference filed by Deloitte & Touche LLP. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/4/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER, Motions terminated: 312 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reset Case Management Conference filed by Sarah Cavanagh, James Brady. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/24/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting 309 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference continued to 12/4/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/6/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 281 283 285 286 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER, Motions terminated: 279 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Adjust Class Certification Schedule filed by Sarah Cavanagh, James Brady. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/2/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER : Further Case Management Conference set for 6/1/12 is continued to 7/19/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/29/12. Motions terminated: 252 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Sarah Cavanagh, James Brady.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DECERTIFICATION AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR APRIL 20, 2012 AT 3:00 PM 200 241 246 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER to unseal Solis Briefs (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER TO UNSEAL DECERTIFICATION BRIEFS 205 , 210 , 214 , 219 re 225 Stipulation. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011) Modified on 9/29/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER continuing motion (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER setting briefing schedule re: motion for decertification (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL CLASS NOTICE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER re: Rule 26 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY AND VACATING NOVEMBER 5, 2010 HEARING (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting extension op out deadline (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER CONTINUING CMC TO 7/16/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER SETTING CMC 7/2/10 @ 3 P.M. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re 75 , 81 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 SEALING ORDER (RE: CORRECTED DECLARATION OF SMITH) re 125 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting leave to file under seal (as modified) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER to remove document from file re 109 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 SEALING ORDER re 90 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SEALING ORDER re 77 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER extending briefing schedule/continuing cmc to 3/12/10 @ 3 p.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER vacating 10/9/09 cmc; continuing motion to 2/19/10; continuing 1/29/10 case management to 3/5/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re: amended complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER continuing cmc to 10/9/09 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER dismissing Sulit (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brady et al v. Deloitte & Touche LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brady
Represented By: Wayne Scott Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Call
Represented By: Wayne Scott Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Cavanagh
Represented By: Wayne Scott Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloitte & Touche LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloitte Tax LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?