Association of Irritated Residents et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: Association of Irritated Residents and Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency, Stephen L. Johnson and Wayne Nastri
Case Number: 3:2008cv00227
Filed: January 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901 Environmental Cleanup Expenses
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/1/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING CONSENT DECREE DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/10/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009) Modified on 8/10/2009 (tdm, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Amend Consent Decree Deadlines. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/15/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/5/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE BILL OF COSTS AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/31/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association of Irritated Residents et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Irritated Residents
Represented By: Brent Joseph Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By: David Richard Pettit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Rochelle Leigh Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen L. Johnson
Represented By: Rochelle Leigh Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Nastri
Represented By: Rochelle Leigh Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?