Luddon v. Curry et al
Petitioner: James F. Luddon
Respondent: B. Curry and B.P.H. Commissioners
Case Number: 3:2008cv00275
Filed: January 16, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of B. Curry against James F. Luddon. The respondents motion to dismiss the petition as untimely is hereby GRANTED and the petition for a writ of habeas corpus is hereby DISMISSED. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING 9 MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION AS UNTIMELY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 21, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING 6 MOTION TO VACATE ORDER OF DISMISSAL; DIRECTING CLERK TO REOPEN ACTION; ORDERING RESPONDENT TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED. The Clerk shall serve by certified mail a copy of this order and the petition, along with the exhibits lodged in support thereof, upon respondent and respondent's counsel, the Attorney General for the State of California. Respondent shall file with the Court and serve on petitioner, within ninety (90) days of the date this order is filed, an answer conforming in all respects to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, showing cause why a writ of habeas corpus should not be granted based on petitioner's cognizable claims. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 16, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009) Modified on 6/17/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT: This action is DISMISSED without prejudice (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luddon v. Curry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James F. Luddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B.P.H. Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?