Lymburner v. U.S. Financial Funds, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dian C. Lymburner
Defendant: U.S. Financial Funding, Inc., IndyMac Bancorp, Inc. and Indymac Federal Bank, FSB
Case Number: 3:2008cv00325
Filed: January 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 134 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 135 Motion for Settlement (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 AMENDED ORDER: 1) PRELIMINARILY APPROVING PROPOSED SETTLEMENT, 2) APPOINTING GILARDI & CO. LLC AS SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATOR, 3) APPROVING REVISED NOTICE OF POROPOSED SETTLEMENT, 4) SETTING HEARING FOR FINAL APPROVAL, filed by Dian C. Lymburner. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 08/24/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER preliminarily approving proposed settlement AND appointing Gilardi & Co LLC as settlement administrator AND approving notice of proposed settlement AND setting filing of and hearing on Joint motion for final approval; Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 8/19/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE MOTION re Letter 124 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/20/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION. On May 25, 2011, the parties requested an extension of time to file their motion for preliminary approval of the settlement in this case. Good cause appearing, the deadline to file the motion is extended to June 17, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/27/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 94 Motion to Certify Class (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Date for Joint Report Regarding Class Definition Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/8/2010 re 114 Stipulation. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 91 Stipulation filed by U.S. Financial Funding, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 6, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING U.S. Financial Funding, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint re 86 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/28/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on April 14, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING Application to Appear Telephonically 80 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/13/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re 75 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Dian C. Lymburner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on February 26, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 3, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint re 45 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/19/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lymburner v. U.S. Financial Funds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dian C. Lymburner
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Financial Funding, Inc.
Represented By: Shahram Nassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Bancorp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indymac Federal Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?