Bray v. Kendall et al
Plaintiff: Leland H. Bray
Defendant: Messmore Kendall, Honey Taylor, Messmore Kendall, III and Alexander Kendall
Case Number: 3:2008cv00535
Filed: January 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/5/10. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting extension of time (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management conference and Hearing on Motion to Dismiss from 6/12/09 to 8/28/09. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/11/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing hearing re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Messmore Kendall to 6/12/09. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/13/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Motion to Dismiss and Case Management Conference to 4/3/09. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/5/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/25/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/29/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/5/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bray v. Kendall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leland H. Bray
Represented By: Robert F. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Messmore Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honey Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Messmore Kendall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?