Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd. et al v. Wikileaks et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd. and Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. Ltd. alleged that Defendants Wikileaks, wikileaks.org and Dynadot LLC unlawfully and wrongfully published confidential bank documents belonging to the Plaintiffs on the Wikileaks.org website.

Plaintiff: Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd. and Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.
Defendant: Wikileaks, Wikileaks.Org and Dynadot LLC
Interested Party: John Shipton and Daniel Mathews
Amicus Curiae: Gannett Co., Inc., Radio Television News Directors Association, Society for Professional Journalists, The Hearst Corporation, California First Amendment Coalition, The E.W. Scripps Co., Citizen Media Law Project, Project on Government Oversight, Public Citizen, Associated Press, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Newspaper Association of America, National Newspaper Association, Los Angeles Times and American Society of Newspaper Editors
Case Number: 3:2008cv00824
Filed: February 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2008 Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/29/08 before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter: Connie Kuhl.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2008)
March 5, 2008 Filing 105 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. (Briggs, William) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 4, 2008 Filing 104 CLERK'S NOTICE advancing Initial Case Management Conference to 5/16/2008 at 09:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2008. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
February 29, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #69 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Proposed] Motion of Public Citizen and California First Amendment Coalition to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(1) and Lift Permanent InjunctionProposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Proposed] Motion of Public Citizen and California First Amendment Coalition to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(1) and Lift Permanent Injunction, #65 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants or, in the Alternative, to Appear as Amici Curiae, #72 MOTION to Intervene and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2008 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 Filing 103 NOTICE by Dynadot LLC of Submission of Service Agreement (Murai, Garret) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER DENYING #48 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; DISSOLVING #49 Stipulated Permanent Injunction; and SETTING Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Motions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 29, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 94 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Laura Rose Handman (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 95 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Paul Alan Levy (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 Filing 99 Minute Entry: Show Cause Hearing (Date Filed: 2/29/2008). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/29/2008)
February 28, 2008 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Project on Government Oversight re #97 Notice (Other) (Mayer, Steven) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
February 28, 2008 Filing 97 NOTICE by Project on Government Oversight of Supplemental Authorities (Mayer, Steven) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
February 28, 2008 Filing 93 NOTICE by John Shipton of Intent to Appear and Joinder in Motions & Oppositions of Amici/Intervenors (Chadwick, James) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
February 28, 2008 Filing 92 QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 28, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
February 28, 2008 Filing 91 DECLARATION of Nicole Fritz in Opposition to #89 Memorandum in Opposition filed byDaniel Mathews. (Related document(s) #89 ) (Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
February 28, 2008 Filing 90 DECLARATION of Daniel Mathews in Opposition to #89 Memorandum in Opposition filed byDaniel Mathews. (Related document(s) #89 ) (Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
February 28, 2008 Filing 89 Memorandum in Opposition to TRO, Preliminary Injunction, and Permanent Injunction filed byDaniel Mathews. (Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
February 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING #82 Stipulated Request for Order Shortening Time. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 28, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
February 28, 2008 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. re #86 Memorandum in Opposition, PROOF OF SERVICE (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
February 28, 2008 Filing 86 Memorandum in Opposition [65,71,72] re PLAINTIFFS BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MULTIPLE APPLICATIONS AND MOTIONS BY PROPOSED AMICI AND/OR REQUESTS TO INTERVENE filed byBank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF EVAN SPIEGEL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MULTIPLE APPLICATIONS AND MOTIONS BY PROPOSED AMICI AND/OR REQUESTS TO INTERVENE)(Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/28/2008) Modified on 2/28/2008 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2008 Received Document (Proposed) Order re 95 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611016312.) by Public Citizen, California First Amendment Coalition. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 Filing 96 AFFIDAVIT of Paul Alan Levy in Support of 95 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611016312.) filed byPublic Citizen, California First Amendment Coalition. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 Filing 95 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-Paul Alan Levy ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611016312.) filed by Public Citizen, California First Amendment Coalition. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Project on Government Oversight re Stipulated Request for Order Shortening Time (Mayer, Steven) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 Filing 84 Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Request for Order Shortening Time by Project on Government Oversight. (Mayer, Steven) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 Filing 83 Declaration of Steven L. Mayer in Support of #82 MOTION Shorten Time Stipulated Request for Order Shortening Time filed byProject on Government Oversight. (Related document(s) #82 ) (Mayer, Steven) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 Filing 82 MOTION Shorten Time Stipulated Request for Order Shortening Time filed by Project on Government Oversight. (Mayer, Steven) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. re #80 Notice (Other) Proof of Service (Attachments: #1 Supplement Email confirmation)(Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 Filing 80 NOTICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. Plaintiffs Notice of Intent to Oppose Third-Party Application to Intervene and/or To File Amici Curiae (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. re #78 Declaration in Support, #77 Brief, PROOF OF SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Supplement Email confirmation)(Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 Filing 78 Declaration of Evan Spiegel in Support of #77 Brief, Declaration of Evan Spiegel in Support of Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief in Support of Application for Preliminary Injunction re Response to the Reporters Committee et al.s Proposed Amici Curiae Brief filed byBank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Part 2 of Spiegel Declaration)(Related document(s) #77 ) (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 Filing 77 Brief Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief in Support of Application for Preliminary Injunction re Response to the Reporters Committee et al.s Proposed Amici Curiae Brief filed byBank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 Filing 76 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611016247.) filed by Amicus Curiae. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Brick (Brick, Ann) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 26, 2008 Received Document re 94 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611016247.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611016247.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611016247.) by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of Newspaper Editors, Associated Press, Citizen Media Law Project, The E.W. Scripps Co., The Hearst Corporation, Los Angeles Times, National Newspaper Association, Newspaper Association of America, Radio Television News Directors Association, Society for Professional Journalists. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 94 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-Laura Rose Handman ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611016247.) filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of Newspaper Editors, Associated Press, Citizen Media Law Project, The E.W. Scripps Co., The Hearst Corporation, Los Angeles Times, National Newspaper Association, Newspaper Association of America, Radio Television News Directors Association, Society for Professional Journalists. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Project on Government Oversight re #72 MOTION to Intervene and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Mayer, Steven) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 73 Proposed Order re #72 MOTION to Intervene and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Project on Government Oversight. (Mayer, Steven) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 72 MOTION to Intervene and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Project on Government Oversight. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer and Cross Complaint)(Mayer, Steven) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 71 MOTION for Administrative Relief (Local Rule 7-11); Declaration of Karl Olson filed by Public Citizen, California First Amendment Coalition. Motion Hearing set for 2/29/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Administrative Relief)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 70 Brief of Intervenors/Amici Curiae Public Citizen and California First Amendment Coalition in Opposition to Injunctive Relief and in Support of Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed byPublic Citizen, California First Amendment Coalition. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 69 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Proposed] Motion of Public Citizen and California First Amendment Coalition to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(1) and Lift Permanent Injunction filed by Public Citizen, California First Amendment Coalition. Motion Hearing set for 2/29/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 68 Declaration of Peter Scheer in Support of Motion of Public Citizen and California First Amendment Coalition to Intervene as Defendants or, in the Alternative, to Appear as Amici Curiae filed byPublic Citizen, California First Amendment Coalition. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 67 Declaration of Peter Lurie in Support of Motion of Public Citizen and California First Amendment Coalition to Intervene as Defendants or, in the Alternative, to Appear as Amici Curiae filed byPublic Citizen, California First Amendment Coalition. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 66 Declaration of Taylor Lincoln in Support of Motion of Public Citizen and California First Amendment Coalition to Intervene as Defendants or, in the Alternative, to Appear as Amici Curiae filed byPublic Citizen, California First Amendment Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 65 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants or, in the Alternative, to Appear as Amici Curiae filed by Public Citizen, California First Amendment Coalition. Motion Hearing set for 2/29/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Project on Government Oversight re #63 Notice of Appearance (Mayer, Steven) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Lee Mayer Application to Appear as Prospective Intervenors or, in the Alternative, Amici Curiae (Mayer, Steven) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 62 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Thomas R. Burke on behalf of Amicus Curiae. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 61 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. re #59 Proposed Order PROOF OF SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Supplement Email Confirmation)(Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 26, 2008 Filing 59 Proposed Order GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (AMENDED) by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
February 25, 2008 Filing 58 Proposed Order re #57 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal [PROPOSED] ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT DYNADOT, LLC by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
February 25, 2008 Filing 57 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT DYNADOT, LLC by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
February 22, 2008 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. re #53 Statement of Non-Opposition, #54 Declaration in Support, PROOF OF SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Supplement EMAIL CONFIRMATION)(Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 22, 2008 Filing 54 Declaration of Evan Spiegel in Support of #53 Statement of Non-Opposition, DECLARATION OF EVAN SPIEGEL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANTS WIKILEAKS AND WIKILEAKS.ORG TO PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND COURT'S OSC filed byBank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 22, 2008 Filing 53 Statement of Non-Opposition PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANTS WIKILEAKS AND WIKILEAKS.ORG TO THE OSC RE PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byBank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 21, 2008 Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 14, 2008 before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter: Katherine Wyatt. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2008)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING #19 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/15/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
February 15, 2008 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. PROOF OF SERVICE RE (i) TRO AND OSC RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and (ii) PERMANENT INJUNCTION (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/15/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction as to defendant DYNADOT LLC (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
February 14, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/29/2008 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
February 14, 2008 Filing 47 STIPULATION Stipulation for Entry of Permanent Injunction and Order by Dynadot LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Murai, Garret) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
February 14, 2008 Filing 46 Proposed Order AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
February 14, 2008 Filing 45 Minute Entry: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held on 2/14/2008 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 2/14/2008). (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dynadot LLC (Murai, Garret) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 43 NOTICE by Dynadot LLC DEFENDANT DYNADOT, LLC'S NOTICE OF AUTHORITIES PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS (Murai, Garret) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. re #41 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Supplement EMAIL VERIFICATION FOR PROOF OF SERVICE)(Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 41 NOTICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TRO AND OSC RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. PROOF OF SERVICE ON DANIEL MATHEWS, OFFICER OF WIKILEAKS (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. PROOF OF SERVICE (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 37 TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/13/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING #29 Ex Parte Application to Permit Alternative Method of Service. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. re #33 Reply Memorandum, #34 Declaration in Support, PROOF OF SERVICE (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 34 Declaration of EVAN SPIEGEL in Support of #33 Reply Memorandum, DECLARATION OF EVAN SPIEGEL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANTS WIKILEAKS AND WIKILEAKS.ORG TO PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR TRO AND OSC filed byBank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Related document(s) #33 ) (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 33 Reply Memorandum PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANTS WIKILEAKS AND WIKILEAKS.ORG TO PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR TRO filed byBank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. re #30 Declaration in Support,, #29 Ex Parte Application FOR: ORDER DEEMING SERVICE EFFECTED, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PERMITTING ALTERNATIVE METHODS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, OR ADDITIONAL TIME, AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, #31 Proposed Order, (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 31 Proposed Order re #30 Declaration in Support,, #29 Ex Parte Application FOR: ORDER DEEMING SERVICE EFFECTED, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PERMITTING ALTERNATIVE METHODS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, OR ADDITIONAL TIME, AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 30 Declaration of EVAN SPIEGEL in Support of #29 Ex Parte Application FOR: ORDER DEEMING SERVICE EFFECTED, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PERMITTING ALTERNATIVE METHODS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, OR ADDITIONAL TIME, AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byBank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PART 1 OF EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF EVAN SPIEGEL, #2 Exhibit PART 2 OF EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF EVAN SPIEGEL)(Related document(s) #29 ) (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 29 Ex Parte Application FOR: ORDER DEEMING SERVICE EFFECTED, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PERMITTING ALTERNATIVE METHODS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, OR ADDITIONAL TIME, AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 28 Letter from Julie S. Turner re Service (reply). (Turner, Julie) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 12, 2008 Filing 27 Letter from William J. Briggs, II. (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
February 12, 2008 Filing 26 Letter from Julie S. Turner re Service. (Turner, Julie) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
February 11, 2008 Filing 52 (UNDER SEAL) EXHIBITS in Support of #5 filed byBank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 11, 2008 Received Document (UNDER SEAL) by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 11, 2008 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE #1 by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT ON DYNADOT (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/11/2008) Modified on 2/12/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2008 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE #1 by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT ON JULIE S. TURNER FOR WIKILEAKS.ORG (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/11/2008) Modified on 2/12/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2008 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE #1 by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT ON JULIE S. TURNER FOR WIKILEAKS (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/11/2008) Modified on 2/12/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2008 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE #14 by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. PROOF OF SERVICE ON WIKILEAKS.ORG RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ISSUANCE OF TRO AND SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/11/2008) Modified on 2/12/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2008 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE #14 by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. PROOF OF SERVICE ON WIKILEAKS RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ISSUANCE OF TRO AND SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/11/2008) Modified on 2/12/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2008 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE #14 by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. PROOF OF SERVICE ON DYNADOT RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ISSUANCE OF TRO AND SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/11/2008) Modified on 2/12/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2008 Filing 19 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal RE: PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL SELECTED EVIDENCE EXHIBITS LODGED TO SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR TRO AND OSC RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND DECLARATION OF WILLIAM J. BRIGGS IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 11, 2008 Filing 18 Request for Judicial Notice re #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #11 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #12 Proposed Order,,, #6 Brief, PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO FRCP RULE 44.1 RE: (1) CAYMAN ISLANDS' CONFIDENTIAL RELATIONSHIPS (PRESERVATION) LAW 16 OF 1976; AND (2) SWISS FEDERAL LAW ON BANKS AND SAVINGS BANKS, ARTICLE 47; AND DECLARATIONS OF MAC IMRIE AND CHRISTOPH HIESTAND IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byBank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Related document(s) #9 , #8 , #11 , #5 , #12 , #6 ) (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 11, 2008 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. re #16 Certificate of Service, OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ISSUANCE OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment 1 to Proof of Service to Dynadot, #2 Supplement Attachment 2 to Proof of Service to Dynadot)(Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 11, 2008 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ISSUANCE OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE #14 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment 1 to Proof of Service, #2 Supplement Attachment 2 to Proof of Service)(Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/11/2008) Modified on 2/12/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2008 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. re #10 Ex Parte Application re #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief, Ex Parte Application re #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief, Ex Parte Application re #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief,, #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #11 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #13 Certificate of Service,,, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #12 Proposed Order,,, #6 Brief, AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ISSUANCE OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE, AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 11, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 11, 2008 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. re #10 Ex Parte Application re #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief, Ex Parte Application re #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief, Ex Parte Application re #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief,, #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #11 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #12 Proposed Order,,, #6 Brief, PROOF OF SERVICE (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 12 Proposed Order re #10 Ex Parte Application re #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief, Ex Parte Application re #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief, Ex Parte Application re #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief,, #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #11 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief, PROPOSED ORDER TO SEAL SELECTED EXHIBITS; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 11 NOTICE by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. re #10 Ex Parte Application re #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief, Ex Parte Application re #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief, Ex Parte Application re #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief,, #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief, NOTICE OF LODGEMENT OF EVIDENCE UNDER SEAL (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 10 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Ex Parte Application re #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Proposed Order, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief, filed by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Part 2 of Ex Parte Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Selected Evidence Exhibits, #2 Supplement Part 3 of Ex Parte Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Selected Evidence Exhibits)(Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/8/2008) Modified on 2/11/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2008 Filing 9 Proposed Order re #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Proposed Order, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief, by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 8 Proposed Order re #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief, by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 7 Request for Judicial Notice re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC, #6 Brief, filed byBank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Related document(s) #5 , #6 ) (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 6 Brief re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC (Part 1) filed byBank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Part 2 of Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Supplement Part 3 of Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #3 Supplement Part 4 of Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #4 Supplement Part 5 of Memorandum of Points & Authorities)(Related document(s) #5 ) (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and TRO and OSC filed by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (Briggs, William) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2008 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2008.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/7/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)
February 6, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 6, 2008 Summons Issued as to Wikileaks, Wikileaks.Org, Dynadot LLC. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 6, 2008 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008) (hdj, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2008 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2008. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 6, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wikileaks, Wikileaks.Org, Dynadot LLC ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611015488.). Filed byBank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2008: #1 Pt2, #2 Pt3, #3 Pt4) (hdj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd. et al v. Wikileaks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: John Shipton
Represented By: James M. Chadwick
Represented By: Rachel E. Matteo-Boehm
Represented By: Adam Paul Brezine
Represented By: Guylyn R Cummins
Represented By: Roger Rex Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Daniel Mathews
Represented By: Joshua Koltun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wikileaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wikileaks.Org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynadot LLC
Represented By: Garret D. Murai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gannett Co., Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura Rose Handmand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Radio Television News Directors Association
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura Rose Handmand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society for Professional Journalists
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura Rose Handmand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Hearst Corporation
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura Rose Handmand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California First Amendment Coalition
Represented By: Karl Olson
Represented By: Paul Alan Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The E.W. Scripps Co.
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura Rose Handmand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Citizen Media Law Project
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura Rose Handmand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Project on Government Oversight
Represented By: Steven Lee Mayer
Represented By: Ann Brick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Citizen
Represented By: Karl Olson
Represented By: Paul Alan Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Associated Press
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura Rose Handmand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura Rose Handmand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Newspaper Association of America
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura Rose Handmand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Newspaper Association
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura Rose Handmand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Los Angeles Times
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura Rose Handmand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Society of Newspaper Editors
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura Rose Handmand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd.
Represented By: William Joseph Briggs, II
Represented By: Martin Dori Singer,
Represented By: Evan Neal Spiegel,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Baer Bank and Trust Co. LTD.
Represented By: William Joseph Briggs, II
Represented By: Martin Dori Singer,
Represented By: Evan Neal Spiegel,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?