Harris v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Angela D. Harris
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2008cv00831
Filed: February 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 13-2156-SI. Signed by Judge Susan Illston, on 04/28/14. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/8/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/7/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 8, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 18 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Remanding for Further Proceedings. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 19 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 18, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela D. Harris
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?