Cantlin v. General Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: Donald Cantlin, Jr.
Defendant: General Electric Company, Cramp Shipbuilding and Drydock Company and Warren Pumps, LLC
Case Number: 3:2008cv00982
Filed: February 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY filed by Donald Cantlin, Jr., Leafie Cantlin Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/1/2014. General Electric Company terminated(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Donald Cantlin, Jr.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/19/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER (MDL 875) by MDL Panel remanding case back to the Northern District of CA; Case reopened. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantlin v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Cantlin, Jr.
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cramp Shipbuilding and Drydock Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?