Wilkins v. Ahern
Plaintiff: Keenan G. Wilkins
Defendant: Greg Ahern
Case Number: 3:2008cv01084
Filed: February 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Case Settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/21/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 387 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas on 9/24/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 384 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Case not settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/27/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 379 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas on 7/1/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER Vacating Status Conference and Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/19/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 372 Certificate of Service re Doc. 371.(njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 368 Certificate of Service re 366 Writ Issued, 365 Order Setting Settlement Conference, Set Hearing. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 366 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plainitff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/7/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER DENYING 343 344 345 352 353 354 355 356 358 PLAINTIFF'S PENDING MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION, TO AMEND, AND TO COMPEL; STAYING ACTION AND REFERRING FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 30, 2014. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER DENYING 323 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 2, 2013.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER DENYING 309 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 20, 2012.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST TO LIFT STAY; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S SEVENTH REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2012. (mmcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER GRANTING 296 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 15, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER GRANTING 172 MOTION TO SEAL MEDICAL RECORDS; GRANTING 176 ALAMEDA COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; GRANTING 195 PRISON HEALTH SERVICES DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 24, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS 215 TO DISQUALIFY, 162 FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AND 163 TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; DIRECTING ALAMEDA COUNTY DEFENDANTS TO INFORM COURT HOW THEY INTEND TO PROCEED WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFF'S NON-MEDICAL AND NON-MENTAL HEALTH CARE CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 11, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER GRANTING 167 DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 27, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 2, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER VACATING PRIOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE; GRANTING 22 DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 16, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF SERVICE; GRANTING 17 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons and the United States Marshal shall serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the SAC (Docket No.18 ) in this matter, all attachments thereto, and a copy of this order upon the following defendants at the Santa Rita County Jail: Deputies Aiello, Alhf, Anderson, Arnold, Arrivas, Bao, Bareno, Bareo, Barrosa, Botz, Boutwell, Brawley, Cabrerass, Cod y, Cunningham, Dalton, De La Fuente, DeLeon, Garcia, Garrington, Gonzales, Lane, Latorre, Maderos, McGill, Noabeck, Pape, Robertson, Shelby, Smith, Snider, St. Denis, Strickland, Tafola, Thibodeaux, Vanzant and Williams; Sheriff Ahern, Commander La D onna Harris; Capt. Melansen; Capt. Wilkinson; Lt. Jurgens-Lewis; Sgt. Quin; Sgt. Shaull; Sgt. Molly; Dr. Chan; Dr. Rosenthal; Dr. Thomas; Dr. Resburg; Nurse Wilfredo Reyes; Nurse Maria; Technician Bryan; Technician Marks; Technician Veazey; Prison He alth Services; Criminal Justice Mental Health; and on Alameda County, through the Office of County Counsel of Alameda County. The Clerk shall also mail courtesy copies of the SAC and this order to the Office of County Counsel of Alameda. Within < b>ninety (90) days of the date of this order is filed, defendants shall file a motion for summary judgment or other dispositive motion with respect to the claim found to be cognizable . IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 16, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009) Modified on 6/18/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING 15 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; GRANTING 4 8 9 PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO AMEND; DENYING 6 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 6, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins v. Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keenan G. Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?