Delil v. Golden Gate Bridge Highway & Transportation District
Plaintiff: Hollynn Delil
Defendant: Golden Gate Bridge Highway & Transportation District
Case Number: 3:2008cv01105
Filed: February 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: American with Disabilities - Other Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/30/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL & TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/29/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Amended Order Continuing Pretrial Deadlines and Trial Date re 26 Stipulation filed by Golden Gate Bridge Highway & Transportation District, Hollynn Delil. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/9/2010. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Continuing Pretrial Deadlines and Trial Date re 26 Stipulation filed by Golden Gate Bridge Highway & Transportation District, Hollynn Delil. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/28/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SCHEDULING CMC re 22 Status Report filed by Hollynn Delil. Signed by Judge Mari-Elena James on 2/2/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE CASE STATUS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/20/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 5/20/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/3/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO COMPLETE ADR re 14 Stipulation filed by Golden Gate Bridge Highway & Transportation District. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/19/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delil v. Golden Gate Bridge Highway & Transportation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollynn Delil
Represented By: Sidney J. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Gate Bridge Highway & Transportation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?