Carpenters Pension Trust Fund for Northern California v. MGM's Cabinet Installation Services et al
Plaintiff: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: MGM's Cabinet Installation Services and Michael Gordon Moxley
Case Number: 3:2008cv01164
Filed: February 27, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2013. Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/19/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Continue]. Case management conference set for 9/22/2011 at 11:00 AM. Joint case management statement due by 9/15/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 55 Status Report, filed by Carpenters Pension Trust Fund for Northern California]. Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/22/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 51 Status Report filed by Carpenters Pension Trust Fund for Northern California]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/9/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2011 03:00 PM. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 9, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Further Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2011 11:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 17, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 44 Case Management Statement filed by Carpenters Pension Trust Fund for Northern California]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/29/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 41 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Carpenters Pension Trust Fund for Northern California]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/19/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO VACATE STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Alsup denying 39 Motion to Continue (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 4/23/2009 AT 11:00 A.M. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/10/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund for Northern California v. MGM's Cabinet Installation Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Roberta D. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM's Cabinet Installation Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gordon Moxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?