The Eidex Family Partnership, L.P. v. Justice
Plaintiff: The Eidex Family Partnership, L.P.
Defendant: Carlvin Justice
Case Number: 3:2008cv01173
Filed: February 27, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 USCA MANDATE ORDER (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER from USCA : All pending motions are DENIED as MOOT; No motion for reconsideration (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying motion to repeal EMC (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 21 Notice (Other) filed by Carlvin Justice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/12/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying 19 Defendant's Motion to Restrict Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/26/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING 15 Motion for NISI PRIUS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/24/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR REASSIGNMENT; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White (Duty Judge) on 10/3/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Eidex Family Partnership, L.P. v. Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Eidex Family Partnership, L.P.
Represented By: Bruce Cameron Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlvin Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?