Bryant et al v. Service Corporation International et al
Plaintiff: Claude Bryant, Craig Fulcher, Sanford Levine and Thomas Thompson
Defendant: Service Corporation International, SCI Funeral and Cemetary Purchasing Cooperative, Inc., SCI Eastern Market Support Center,L.P., L.P. SCI Western Market Support Center, L.P., SCI Houston Market Support Center, L.P., Jane D. Jones and Thomas Ryan
Case Number: 3:2008cv01190
Filed: February 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 426 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER continuing motion (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 381 JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER continuing hearing (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER granting phone appearances (counsel shall inform the court of the names and phone numbers of counsel attending - court will initiate the conference) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER continuing cmc to 12/16/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER Consenting to Plaintiffs' Filing of Third Amended Complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO COMPEL DEPOSITION(Docket No. 286) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL (Docket Nos. 280, 283) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER continuing both the motion and cmc to 4/30/10 at 9:00 am. with signature. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER continuing both the motion and cmc to 4/30/10 at 9:00 a.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND SANCTIONS, SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A STAY 254 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting substitution (with judicial signature) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER Withdrawing Affirmation of Craig Fulcher (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING TO 2/25/10 @ 4 P.M. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 228 CORRECT ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER RE: PAGE LIMIT re 224 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION[Docket No. 205] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 SEALING ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 5/14/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 SCHEDULING ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER withdrawing motions re 80 , 90 , 95 . Signed by Judge Illston on 2/17/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009) Modified on 2/18/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER re motion to compel. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/2/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER continuing hearings. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/21/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY REQUEST [Docket No. 119] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2008)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/27/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant et al v. Service Corporation International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Corporation International
Represented By: Steven Hazard Gurnee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI Funeral and Cemetary Purchasing Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Hazard Gurnee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI Eastern Market Support Center,L.P.
Represented By: Steven Hazard Gurnee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.P. SCI Western Market Support Center
Represented By: Steven Hazard Gurnee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.P.
Represented By: Steven Hazard Gurnee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI Houston Market Support Center, L.P.
Represented By: Steven Hazard Gurnee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane D. Jones
Represented By: Steven Hazard Gurnee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Ryan
Represented By: Steven Hazard Gurnee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Bryant
Represented By: Sanford Jay Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Fulcher
Represented By: Sanford Jay Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanford Levine
Represented By: Sanford Jay Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Thompson
Represented By: Sanford Jay Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?