Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity, Los Padres Forest Watch, Sierra Club, Defenders of Wildlife and California Native Plant Society
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration National Marine Fisheries Service and U.S. Forest Service
Case Number: 3:2008cv01278
Filed: March 5, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 16:1538 Endangered Species Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 127 Stipulated Final Judgment filed by U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Forest Service. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/7/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 105 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Remand; and continuing Case Management Conference (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION AND ORDER re plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/4/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING BRIEFING TO ALLOW SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS re 98 94 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Los Padres Forest Watch, California Native Plant Society, Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Sierra Club. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/2/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting 81 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Remand. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/20/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE OPPOSITION BRIEF BY 1/6/12 re 88 Notice (Other) filed by U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Forest Service. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/4/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part 78 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting 76 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration re-set for 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Plaintiffs' Opposition brief due 11/04/2011. Defendants' Reply due 11/11/2011. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/19/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/16/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to 1/21/2009 for federal defendants to file reply; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/7/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Marc D. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Padres Forest Watch
Represented By: Marc D. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Marc D. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Marc D. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Native Plant Society
Represented By: Marc D. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration National Marine Fisheries Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?