Black v. Potter
Plaintiff: Harold Black
Defendant: John E. Potter
Case Number: 3:2008cv01344
Filed: March 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/19/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER RE: 67 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 09/23/10. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re 65 Order Rescheduling Settlement Conference, Set Hearings, Order Rescheduling Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge. Settlement Conference Rescheduled for 8/11/2010 10:00 AM.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 5/28/10. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting request to continue litigation schedule. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER extending discovery and motions deadlines (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER[Docket No. 53] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2010)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER to produce (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY re 16 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?