Ramos v. Bank of America et al
Plaintiff: Lena Monzon Ramos
Defendant: Bank of America, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Bank of America Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 3:2008cv01375
Filed: March 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 72 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion to Strike ; granting 77 Motion for Summary Judgment (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re 67 Exhibits, filed by Bank of America Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/2/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DATE FOR OPPOSITION BRIEFS ON PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 78 Stipulation filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/1/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS re 64 Stipulation filed by Bank of America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/17/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 53 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR ENLARGEMENT OF PAGE LIMITATIONS re 40 STIPULATED REQUEST filed by Lena Monzon Ramos. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/5/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009) Modified on 5/5/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY DATES AND DEADLINES re 38 Stipulation filed by Bank of America Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/20/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY DATES AND DEADLINES re 36 Stipulation filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/26/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE TO COMPLETE ADR AND DISCOVERY DATES re 33 Stipulation, filed by Bank of America Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/30/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING MEDIATION re 26 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation filed by Bank of America, Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/15/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION TO COMPEL re 24 Stipulation filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/30/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Bank of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Monzon Ramos
Represented By: Joseph Allen Garofolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?