Hitch v. Randlett
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Hitch
Defendant: Victoria Randlett
Case Number: 3:2008cv01397
Filed: March 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing claims and counterclaims with prejudice; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/27/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER (NINETY DAY CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL); Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/14/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Further Case Management Conference continued to 5/18/2009 04:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/20/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER:Case Management Conference continued to 4/20/2009 04:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/26/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Case Management Conference reset for 3/2/2009 04:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/30/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER; Further Case Management Conference continued to 2/2/2009 03:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/7/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Further Case Management Conference continued to 1/12/2009 03:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/18/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Case Management Conference reset for 11/24/2008 04:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/9/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hitch v. Randlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Hitch
Represented By: Jefferson Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Randlett
Represented By: Harold Mitchell Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?