Saint Francis Memorial Hospital et al v. Leavitt
Plaintiff: Saint Francis Memorial Hospital and Franklin Benevolent Corporation
Defendant: Michael O. Leavitt
Case Number: 3:2008cv01440
Filed: March 13, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 27, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT NO LATER THAN JULY 27, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 13, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT NO LATER THAN JULY 10, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 7, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE: JOINT STATUS REPORT. The parties' joint request that the stay be extended through June 4, 2012 is granted, and the parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report no later than June 4, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 16, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT NO LATER THAN MAY 4, 2012.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 9, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE: JOINT STATUS REPORT. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than April 4, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 23, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. The Court grants the parties' joint request that they be given an additional thirty-one (31) days, through February 17, 2012, to file a Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 23, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT NO LATER THAN JANUARY 17, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE STATUS REPORT. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report no later than December 4, 2009, and every six months thereafter. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 14, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION; ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. The parties are directed to file a joint status report no later than July 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 11, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment shall be filed no later than December 12, 2008. Defendant's opposition and cross-motion shall be filed no later than January 16, 200 9. Plaintiffs' opposition and reply shall be filed no later than March 6, 2009. Defendant's reply shall be filed no later than April 8, 2009. Unless the parties are otherwise advised, no hearing will be conducted on the parties' respective motions. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE: JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING THE PARTIES' VIEWS ON ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION. The parties need not participate in ADR at this time. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saint Francis Memorial Hospital et al v. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Francis Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Gary E. Gleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Benevolent Corporation
Represented By: Gary E. Gleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?