Anderson v. Federal Express Corporation
Plaintiff: Kyle Anderson
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Case Number: 3:2008cv01441
Filed: March 13, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/21/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER removing case from Mediation Program/Referring case to private mediation. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/20/08. (tsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER continuing cmc to 1/16/09 @ 2:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/30/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 14 . Plaintiffs shall file a dismissal and second amended complaint no later than 9/26/08. Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Federal Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Anderson
Represented By: Waukeen Quandrico McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Christopher James Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?