Salinas et al v. Amteck of Kentucky, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Reynaldo Salinas, Isabel Salinas and Jessica Salinas
Defendant: Amteck of Kentucky, Inc., US Trades, LLC, Haskell Company and Snorkel International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv01463
Filed: March 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 214 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/25/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE SNORKEL'S AMENDED BILL OF COSTS re 209 Stipulation filed by Reynaldo Salinas, Jessica Salinas, Isabel Salinas, Gerardo Salinas, Alejandra Salinas. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/4/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 160 Motion for Summary Judgment (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/3/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Notice and ORDER Continuing Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/16/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009) Modified on 10/19/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/6/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER REGARDING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 72 Letter filed by Reynaldo Salinas, Jessica Salinas, Isabel Salinas. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/1/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION OF CASES re (14 in 3:08-cv-04939-PJH) Stipulation filed by Haskell Company, Amteck of Kentucky, Inc., (70 in 3:08-cv-01463-PJH) Stipulation filed by Haskell Company, Amteck of Kentucky, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/20/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salinas et al v. Amteck of Kentucky, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynaldo Salinas
Represented By: Michael A. Hawash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Salinas
Represented By: Michael A. Hawash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Salinas
Represented By: Michael A. Hawash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amteck of Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: Sandra Sterba-Boatwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Trades, LLC
Represented By: Jason Robert Marlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haskell Company
Represented By: Sandra Sterba-Boatwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snorkel International, Inc.
Represented By: Tonya Beane Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?