Polk v. Cavin et al
Plaintiff: Susan Mae Polk
Defendant: James Cavin, Matt Chertkow and Contra Costa County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 3:2008cv01483
Filed: March 17, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER DENYING 290 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 13, 2013.(mmcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER DENYING 255 , 256 , 257 REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; DENYING REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS; DENYING REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 19, 2013.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER DENYING 249 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 19, 2013.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO SUBMIT OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER OF NOVEMBER 27, 2012. The Court extends to January 25, 2013 the deadline for plaintiff to file and serve any objections to the Magistrate Judge's order of November 27, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 2, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING REQUEST FOR STAY. The deadline to file opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment is extended to February 27, 2013. The deadline to file a reply remains as scheduled, specifically, within fifteen days of the date on which plaintiff's opposition is filed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 6, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO EXTEND FUTURE DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF A LIMITED EXTENSION OF TIME. Plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment is due on or before December 6, 2012. Defendants' reply is due 15 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 16, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2012: # 1 Certificate of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Gibson and Roberts's Notice of Motion; Motion to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(6), or Alternatively Motion to Sever Under FRCP 21 filed by Roberts, Gibson Replies due by 1/18/2012. Responses due by 1/3/2012.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/9/11. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COSTS ON APPEAL; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 17, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING 62 EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO OPPOSE DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 2, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING 56 PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; DENYING 56 APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 7, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING 42 , 47 , 50 , PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; STRIKING 51 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 2, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 36 DEFENDANTS GIBSON AND ROBERTS'S FIRST REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 3, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING 23 MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND 31 APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 12, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF SERVICE; DENYING 13 MOTION TO DISQUALIFY. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons and the United States Marshal shall serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the 11 Third Amended complaint in this matter, all attachments thereto, and a copy of this order upon: (1) Defendants Deputy James Cavin, Sgt. Matt Chertkow and Sheriff Warren Rupf at the Contra Costa County Sheriff's Department; (2) defendants Sgt. Roberts and Sgt. Gibson at the Central California Women's Facility in Chowchilla; and (3) defendant Warden Gail Patrick at the California at the California Department of Corrections in Sacramento. The Clerk shall also mail a courtesy copy of the complaint and this order to the California Attorney Gener al's Office. Within ninety (90) days of the date this order is filed, defendants shall file a motion for summary judgment or other dispositive motion with respect to the claim found to be cognizable. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 30, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009) Modified on 5/4/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polk v. Cavin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Mae Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Chertkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?