Wilkins-Jones v. County of Alameda
Plaintiff: Shawna Wilkins-Jones
Defendant: County of Alameda
Case Number: 3:2008cv01485
Filed: March 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 231 Defendants' Motion for Relief from the Court's 8/19/11 Order; Denying 233 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Motion for Relief; Vacating in Part the Court's 8/19/11 Order; and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 231 MOTION RELIEF FROM 8/19/11 ORDER OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO SEEK RECONSIDERATION reset for 6/22/12 re 204 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Leave to File , 240 Propose d Order., STIPULATION AND ORDER re 240 Proposed Order filed by Shawna Wilkins-Jones Responses due by 5/15/2012. Replies due by 5/29/2012. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/26/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER EXCUSING Unopposed Request to Excuse Individual Defendants' Attendance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/5/2012. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 216 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 209 Motion to Continue CMC (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 176 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 187 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 185 Plaintiff's Application for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 STIPULATION AND ORDER r BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 183 Stipulation filed by County of Alameda. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/8/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Further Case Management Conference continued to 4/4/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Joint statement due one week prior to the conference; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/15/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 STIPULATION AND ORDER setting Further Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before the Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel; Joint supplemental Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2011; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/10/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting in part and denying in part 99 109 Motions for Summary Judgment (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 09/27/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND FILING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 09/02/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 125 Stipulation filed by County of Alameda. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/11/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER of clarification on 102 Order denying motions for leave for reconsideration; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/14/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS for leave/reconsideration 98 95 ; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/6/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 65 defendant's Motion to Dismiss re injunctive relief (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 59 Letter filed by Shawna Wilkins-Jones. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/15/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting Status Conference set for 8/31/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/9/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 36 Proposed Order filed by Shawna Wilkins-Jones. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/5/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Status Conference continued to 3/30/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/23/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 27 Proposed Order filed by Shawna Wilkins-Jones. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/22/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/4/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING 21 MINUTES; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/1/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins-Jones v. County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Wilkins-Jones
Represented By: Ann Michele Winterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?