Vela v. AT&T Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Louis J. Vela
Defendant: AT&T Inc., AT&T Disability Income Plan, SBC Communications, Inc. and Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv01575
Filed: March 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. The matter is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 12, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER VACATING ALL COURT DATES. If Plaintiff has not dismissed the action within 21 days of this Order, the parties shall submit, no later than March 9, 2012, a joint statement advising the Court as to the status of the settlement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 10, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 AMENDED ORDER TO FURTHER CONTINUE FILING DATES RELATED TO PARTIES' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The parties' deadline for re-noticing their respective Motions for Summary Judgment and for filing further briefing in support of those motion s is continued to February 28, 2012. The deadline for filing responses to further briefing is continued to March 16, 2012. The Case Management Conference, currently scheduled for January 20, 2012, is continued to June 1, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER TO CONTINUE FILING DATES RELATED TO PARTIES' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The parties' deadline for re-noticing their respective motions for aummary judgment and for filing further briefing is continued from November 4, 2011 to December 5, 2011. The deadline for filing responses to further briefing is continued from November 18, 2011 to December 19, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 24, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to January 20, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 13, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiff and defendant shall renotice their respective motions for summary judgment and may file further briefing of not more than 10 pages in length, by November 4, 2011. Plaintiff and defendant may file responses to the further briefing of not more than 5 pages in length by November 18, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 12, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference scheduled for May 20, 2011 is continued to July 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/3/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF OPPORTUNITY TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 1, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to December 18, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 24, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to August 28, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 6, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER VACATING MAY 29, 2009 HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 26, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING CASE DEADLINES. Defendant's reply shall be filed no later than May 15, 2009. The hearing on the parties' motions for summary judgment shall be on May 29, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 17, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULE 5-1. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 10, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING CASE DEADLINES. Plaintiff's motion shall be filed no later than February 20, 2009. Defendant's opposition and cross-motion shall be filed no later than March 20, 2009. Plaintiff's reply to defendant&# 039;s opposition and opposition to defendant's cross-motion shall be filed no later than April 17, 2009. Defendant's reply shall be filed no later than May 8, 2009. The hearing on the motions shall be on May 22, 2009. The Case Management Conference is continued to July 17, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 18, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 20, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff shall file the Second Amended Complaint no later than October 24, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 8, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vela v. AT&T Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis J. Vela
Represented By: Lee S. Harris, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Disability Income Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBC Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?