Jackson et al v. Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati Long Term Disability Plan et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Jackson and E Lynn Schoenmann
Defendant: Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati Long Term Disability Plan and Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2008cv01607
Filed: March 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING 109 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 25, 2013. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 88 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati Long Term Disability Plan, Prudential Insurance Company of America. Opposition due by 1/7/2011. Replies due by 1/14/2011. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/13/10. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING 85 Stipulation TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING 80 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants' Motion for Attorneys Fees. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/9/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 60 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/17/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING Modified 54 Stipulation re Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Dispositive Cross-Motions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 6, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 33 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING 38 Stipulation REQUESTING MODIFICATION OF REMAINING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/20/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 33 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 16, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC PARTICIPATION OF PARTIES' REPRESENTATIVES AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 12/8/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 24 Motion to Establish De Novo Standard of Review. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/20/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati Long Term Disability Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Jackson
Represented By: Richard Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E Lynn Schoenmann
Represented By: Richard Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?